Cédric Bernard
domiciled in Aussonee, from France Active mandates: MEAS Switzerland SA Connected persons: Olivier Potavin, Marc Alexis Gretillat, Franklin Dwyer Guidone You can stay up to date through "Cédric Bernard", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Cédric Bernard"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Cédric Bernard", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Cédric Bernard"
|
|
Cédric Bernard
domiciled in Genolier, from Bex Active mandates: GAY FRERES HOLDING SA, SOCIETE NOUVELLE DE PLACEMENTS ET D'INVESTISSEMENTS SA Connected persons: Frédéric P. M. Gay, Isabelle Marie Hélène Gay, Henri Danguy des Déserts and more You can stay up to date through "Cédric Bernard", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Cédric Bernard"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Cédric Bernard", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Cédric Bernard"
|
|
Cédric Bernard
domiciled in Seynod, from France Active mandates: Crédit Agricole next bank (Suisse) SA Connected persons: Mattia Salvadori, Jonathan Pugin, Simon Mathevet and more You can stay up to date through "Cédric Bernard", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Cédric Bernard"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Cédric Bernard", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Cédric Bernard"
|
Places where people with the name Cédric Bernard live
Sectors in which people with the name Cédric Bernard work
Manufacturing of other electrical equipment/appliances
Operation of investment companies
Operation of other financial institutions
Operation of banks and credit institutions
Manufacturing of other electrical equipment/appliances
Operation of investment companies
Operation of other financial institutions
Operation of banks and credit institutions
Private persons with the name Cédric Bernard
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Cédric Bernard
Publication number: HR02-1006027690, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
GAY FRERES HOLDING SA, in Zug, CHE-103.451.658, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 77 vom 21.04.2022, Publ. 1005455145).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gay, Jacques-Hubert, von Genève, in Bagnes, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gay, Isabelle, von Genève, in Val de Bagnes, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Bagnes, Vizepräsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Gay, Frédéric P. M., von Genève, in Thônex, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Bernard, Cédric, von Bex, in Genolier, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004522662, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
TE Connectivity Solutions GmbH, in Steinach, CHE-105.215.703, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 144 vom 27.07.2018, Publ. 4386391).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bernard, Cédric, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Aussonne (FR), Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, .
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Egloff, Saletta, von Wettingen, in Rorschacherberg, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: 3061381, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 175 vom 09.09.2016, publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 7'974 vom 06.09.2016. TE Connectivity Solutions GmbH, in Steinach, CHE-105.215.703, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 175 vom 09.09.2016, Publ. 3047469).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bernard, Cédric, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Aussonne (FR), Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [nicht: in Aussonee (FR), Gesellschafter mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Gerosa, Michael, von Schaffhausen, in Balgach, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [nicht: von Thusis, in Buchberg];
Svensson, Lars Johan Magnus, genannt Magnus, schwedischer Staatsangehöriger, in Steinsel (LU), Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [nicht: Svensson, Magnus, Geschäftsführer].