Martin Barner
domiciled in Flurlingen, from Dietwil Active mandates: BA4 Architektur GmbH in Liquidation, Barner AG and more Connected persons: Ruth Barner, Ruth Barner, Ruth Barner You can stay up to date through "Martin Barner", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Barner"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Martin Barner", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Barner"
|
Places where people with the name Martin Barner live
Sectors in which people with the name Martin Barner work
Architectural and engineering activities
General structural engineering
Operation of other financial institutions
Architectural and engineering activities
General structural engineering
Operation of other financial institutions
Private persons with the name Martin Barner
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Martin Barner
Publication number: HR02-1005941537, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
BA4 Architektur GmbH, in Schaffhausen, CHE-115.342.504, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 49 vom 10.03.2022, Publ. 1005424090).
Firma neu:
BA4 Architektur GmbH in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 16.01.2024 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Barner, Martin, von Dietwil, in Flurlingen, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 12 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 5'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 3838513, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
IGV Rainer Heller Partner AG, in Schaffhausen, CHE-105.914.497, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 51 vom 14.03.2016, Publ. 2721209).
Firma neu:
IGV Rainer Heller Partner AG in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 25.10.2017 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Barner, Martin, von Dietwil, in Flurlingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: einziges Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Rainer Heller, Erika, von Erlenbach (ZH), in Büsingen (DE), Liquidatorin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 6937344, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
IGV Rainer Heller Partner AG, in Schaffhausen, CH-290.3.002.694-5, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 39 vom 24.02.2012, S. 0, Publ. 6567600).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sigrist, Heinrich, von Winterthur, in Uster, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Unterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Barner, Martin, von Dietwil, in Flurlingen, einziges Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift].