Esther Adler-Keusch
domiciled in Menzingen, from Boswil Active mandates: Synacon GmbH Connected persons: Martin Ingo Adler You can stay up to date through "Esther Adler-Keusch", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Esther Adler-Keusch"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Esther Adler-Keusch", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Esther Adler-Keusch"
|
Places where people with the name Esther Adler-Keusch live
Sectors in which people with the name Esther Adler-Keusch work
IT services
IT services
Private persons with the name Esther Adler-Keusch
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Esther Adler-Keusch
Publication number: 2955651, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
COVASYS Wyttenbach & Zenger, in Zug, CHE-115.601.054, Einzelunternehmen (SHAB Nr. 14 vom 21.01.2016, Publ. 2610229).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Adler-Keusch, Esther, von Boswil, in Menzingen, Prokuristin, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: 1459949, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
COVASYS Wyttenbach & Zenger, in Zug, CHE-115.601.054, Kollektivgesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 16 vom 24.01.2013, Publ. 7030924).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Adler-Keusch, Esther, von Boswil, in Menzingen, Prokuristin, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: in Zug];
Wyttenbach, Bernard, von Gelterfingen, in Wettingen, Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Gesellschafter mit Einzelunterschrift];
Zenger, Dr. Christoph, von Habkern, in Wollerau, Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Gesellschafter mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 5604956, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
COVASYS AG, in Zug, CH-170.3.024.468-0, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 115 vom 18.06.2009, S. 33, Publ. 5074298).
Firma neu:
COVASYS AG in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 19.04.2010 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
von Siebenthal, Dr. Walter, von Saanen, in Bäch SZ, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Adler-Keusch, Esther, von Boswil, in Zug, Prokuristin, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wyttenbach, Bernard, von Gelterfingen, in Wettingen, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift];
Zenger, Dr. Christoph, von Habkern, in Wollerau, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift].