Address
c/o Rolf Muhmenthaler
Leimenstrasse 44
2575 Täuffelen
Reports for Witag AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Witag AG
- Witag AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Täuffelen. Witag AG belongs to the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active.
- The management has 2 active persons registered.
- On the 01.05.2023 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of BE is CHE-101.315.671.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.11.2000
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Täuffelen
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.4.026.821-9
UID/VAT
CHE-101.315.671
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Erstellen, Halten, Führen und Verwalten sowie den Kauf und Verkauf von Immobilien, das Erbringen von damit zusammenhängenden oder anderen Dienstleistungen und das Ausführen von Management Aufgaben. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke und Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, verwalten, finanzieren und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
unico thun ag | Thun | 21.10.2014 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
SRG Schweizerische Revisionsgesellschaft AG | Bern | 24.08.2009 | 20.10.2014 | |
Treuhand Lehmann AG | Bern | 05.09.2006 | 23.08.2009 | |
ursroth.gf ag in Liquidation | Ostermundigen | <2004 | 04.09.2006 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Wohnguet AG
- Montlig Wohn- und Pflegeheim AG
- Montlig Wohn- und Pflegeheim GmbH
- Presta Bau GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Witag AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005735432, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Wohnguet AG, in Täuffelen, CHE-101.315.671, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 91 vom 13.05.2015, S.0, Publ. 2151193).
Statutenänderung:
22.03.2023.
Firma neu:
Witag AG.
Domizil neu:
c/o Rolf Muhmenthaler, Leimenstrasse 44, 2575 Täuffelen.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Erstellen, Halten, Führen und Verwalten sowie den Kauf und Verkauf von Immobilien, das Erbringen von damit zusammenhängenden oder anderen Dienstleistungen und das Ausführen von Management Aufgaben. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke und Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, verwalten, finanzieren und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre: per Brief oder E-Mail. [Streichung der Bemerkung, da nicht zum Eintragungstext gehörend] [gestrichen: Die vor der Eintragung im Handelsregister Berner Jura-Seeland gestrichenen Tatsachen, sowie allfällige frühere Statutendaten oder Tagebuch- und SHAB-Zitate können im Registerauszug des bisherigen Sitzes, welcher bei den abgelegten Handelsregisterakten liegt, eingesehen werden.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wenger, Beat, von Thun, in Spiez, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Muhmenthaler, Rolf, von Sumiswald, in Täuffelen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.