Reports for Wohnbaugenossenschaft Bundespersonal Lyss
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Wohnbaugenossenschaft Bundespersonal Lyss
- Wohnbaugenossenschaft Bundespersonal Lyss in Lyss is a Cooperative from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». Wohnbaugenossenschaft Bundespersonal Lyss is active.
- The management consists of 3 persons. The organization was founded on 08.06.1959.
- The organization has last modified its commercial register entry on 16.07.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The UID registered in the commercial register of BE is CHE-101.650.744.
Management (3)
newest members of the administration
Franziska Küpfer-Meister,
Mathias Wohlmuth,
Kurt Aeschbacher
newest authorized signatories
Franziska Küpfer-Meister,
Mathias Wohlmuth,
Kurt Aeschbacher
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.06.1959
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Lyss
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.5.002.785-4
UID/VAT
CHE-101.650.744
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Genossenschaft verfolgt den Zweck, in gemeinsamer Selbsthilfe und Mitverantwortung ihren Mitgliedern gesunden und preisgünstigen Wohnraum zu verschaffen und zu erhalten. Sie vermietet ihre Wohnungen in erster Linie an Mitarbeiter/innen und Pensionierte der allgemeinen Bundesverwaltung, der Swisscom, der Post, der SBB, der eidg. Militärbetriebe sowie Organisationen, die der Pensionskasse PUBLICA angeschlossen sind.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Heimann Treuhand | Biel/Bienne | 15.04.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Wohnbaugenossenschaft Bundespersonal Lyss
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006085471, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Wohnbaugenossenschaft Bundespersonal Lyss, in Lyss, CHE-101.650.744, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 60 vom 27.03.2019, Publ. 1004596725).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Martinec, Theres, von Lyss, in Lyss, Mitglied, Sekretärin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Küpfer-Meister, Franziska, von Sumiswald, in Lyss, Mitglied und Sekretärin der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Aeschbacher, Kurt, von Radelfingen, in Lyss, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1004596725, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Wohnbaugenossenschaft Bundespersonal Lyss, in Lyss, CHE-101.650.744, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 95 vom 17.05.2017, Publ. 3526639).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Leuenberger, Patrick, von Bühl, in Lyss, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wohlmuth, Mathias, von Lyss, in Lyss, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3526639, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Wohnbaugenossenschaft Bundespersonal Lyss, in Lyss, CHE-101.650.744, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 154 vom 11.08.2016, Publ. 2998955).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Krähenbühl, Erich Ernst, von Zäziwil, in Lyss, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Leuenberger, Patrick, von Bühl, in Lyss, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.