Reports for Verfag AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Verfag AG
- Verfag AG has its legal headquarters in Zofingen and is active. It operates in the sector «Operation of other financial institutions».
- The company was founded on 16.01.1934 and has 3 persons in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 16.01.2014.
- The company is registered in the commercial register AG under the UID CHE-102.331.520.
Management (3)
newest board members
Dr. Daniel Hunkeler,
Gabriele Eberle-Hunkeler,
Franz Hunkeler
newest authorized signatories
Dr. Daniel Hunkeler,
Gabriele Eberle-Hunkeler,
Franz Hunkeler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.01.1934
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zofingen
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.010.572-1
UID/VAT
CHE-102.331.520
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb und dauernde Verwaltung von Beteiligungen an Unternehmen aller Art und Finanzierung von der Gesellschaft verbundener und nahestehender Unternehmungen im In- und Ausland sowie Erbringung von Management-, Controlling- und Verwaltungsaufgaben; kann Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten, vermieten und veräussern, Zweigniederlassungen errichten sowie sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Luzern | <2004 | 12.07.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Verfag Verkaufs-Gesellschaft von Fabrikanten für Fahrzeugverdunklung AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Verfag AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 1289353, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Verfag AG, in Zofingen, CHE-102.331.520, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 133 vom 13.07.2010, S. 3, Publ. 5724888).
Domizil neu:
Rebbergstrasse 41a, 4800 Zofingen.
Publication number: 5724888, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Verfag AG, in Zofingen, CH-400.3.010.572-1, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 90 vom 09.05.2000, S. 3117).
Statutenänderung:
26.03.2010.
Zweck neu:
Erwerb und dauernde Verwaltung von Beteiligungen an Unternehmen aller Art und Finanzierung von der Gesellschaft verbundener und nahestehender Unternehmungen im In- und Ausland sowie Erbringung von Management-, Controlling- und Verwaltungsaufgaben;
kann Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten, vermieten und veräussern, Zweigniederlassungen errichten sowie sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch eingetragene Adresse.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 26.03.2010 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hunkeler, Rolf, von Wikon und Malters, in Wikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hunkeler, Rosmarie, von Wikon und Malters, in Zofingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG, in Luzern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hunkeler, Franz, von Wikon und Malters, in Zofingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift];
Eberle-Hunkeler, Gabriele, von Wikon und Malters, in Gränichen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hunkeler, Daniel, von Wikon und Malters, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Verfag AG, in Z o f i n g e n, Entwicklung und Vermarktung von Papierverarbeitungsmaschinen usw., Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 104 vom 31.05.1996, S. 3180).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Revisuisse Price Waterhouse AG, in Luzern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG, in Luzern, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.