Reports for SUZUKI SCHWEIZ AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SUZUKI SCHWEIZ AG
- SUZUKI SCHWEIZ AG from Safenwil operates in the sector «Car dealership» and is active.
- There are 12 active persons registered in the management.
- On the 15.09.2023 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the company SUZUKI SCHWEIZ AG is registered under the UID CHE-111.661.821.
- Next to the company SUZUKI SCHWEIZ AG there are 9 other active companies with an identical address. These include: BY Cars AG, Docar AG, EFEC SCHWEIZ AG.
Management (12)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Koichi Suzuki,
Christian Sprenger,
Roger Kunz,
Hans Peter Flückiger,
Stefan Gass
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.05.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Safenwil
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.025.455-9
UID/VAT
CHE-111.661.821
Sector
Car dealership
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Gegenstand und Zweck der Gesellschaft sind: - Import und Vertrieb in der Schweiz und dem Fürstentum Liechtenstein von Fahrzeugen, Motorrädern und Aussenbordmotoren der Marke Suzuki sowie von Ersatzteilen, Zubehör und Accessoires für Fahrzeuge, Motorräder und Aussenbordmotoren. - Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an andern Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben oder weiterveräussern, sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | 26.05.2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- SUZUKI SUISSE SA
- SUZUKI SWITZERLAND LTD.
- SUZUKI AUTOMOBILE SCHWEIZ AG
- SUZUKI AUTOMOBILES SWITZERLAND LTD
- SUZUKI AUTOMOBILES SUISSE SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SUZUKI SCHWEIZ AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005839255, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
SUZUKI SCHWEIZ AG, in Safenwil, CHE-111.661.821, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 34 vom 17.02.2023, Publ. 1005681623).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Suzuki, Takanori, japanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Shizuoka (JP), Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Suzuki, Koichi, japanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Hamamatsu (JP), Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005681623, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
SUZUKI SCHWEIZ AG, in Safenwil, CHE-111.661.821, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 180 vom 16.09.2022, Publ. 1005563361).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sprenger, Christian, von Sirnach, in Boppelsen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005563361, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
SUZUKI SCHWEIZ AG, in Safenwil, CHE-111.661.821, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 100 vom 24.05.2022, Publ. 1005480979).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Flückiger, Hans Peter, von Auswil, in Teufenthal (AG), Vizedirektor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Laufenburg].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.