Address
c/o Johannes Sonderer
Steigstrasse 11
9621 Oberhelfenschwil
Reports for Skilift AG, Oberhelfenschwil
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Skilift AG, Oberhelfenschwil
- Skilift AG, Oberhelfenschwil has its legal headquarters in Oberhelfenschwil and is active. It operates in the sector «Transportation of passenger and freight by road».
- The management has 5 active persons registered.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 20.02.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of SG under the UID CHE-102.566.572.
Management (5)
newest board members
Stefan Scheurer,
Remo Eugster,
Johannes Sonderer,
Roger Perret,
Irene Vollenweider-Huber
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.11.1970
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Neckertal
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.011.536-3
UID/VAT
CHE-102.566.572
Sector
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb eines Skiliftes. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an weiteren Unternehmen ähnlicher oder gleicher Art beteiligen, oder solche selber erstellen und betreiben sowie Liegenschaften, Anlagen und Rechte erwerben, belasten, veräussern, pachten oder verpachten.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Skilift AG Oberhelfenschwil
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Skilift AG, Oberhelfenschwil
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005965945, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Skilift AG, Oberhelfenschwil, in Neckertal, CHE-102.566.572, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 36 vom 21.02.2023, Publ. 1005683745).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Looser, Brigitte, von Neckertal, in Oberhelfenschwil (Neckertal), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Scheurer, Stefan, von Kirchlindach, in Oberhelfenschwil (Neckertal), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005683745, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Skilift AG, Oberhelfenschwil, in Oberhelfenschwil, CHE-102.566.572, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 122 vom 27.06.2022, Publ. 1005505404).
Sitz neu:
Neckertal.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sonderer, Johannes, von Appenzell, in Oberhelfenschwil (Neckertal), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Oberhelfenschwil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Looser, Brigitte, von Neckertal, in Oberhelfenschwil (Neckertal), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Hemberg, in Oberhelfenschwil];
Perret, Roger, von Renan (BE), in Oberhelfenschwil (Neckertal), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Oberhelfenschwil];
Eugster, Remo, von Altstätten, in Oberhelfenschwil (Neckertal), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: in Oberhelfenschwil];
Vollenweider-Huber, Irene, von Andelfingen, in Oberhelfenschwil (Neckertal), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: von Adlikon, in Oberhelfenschwil]. [behördliche Änderung infolge Gemeindefusion]. [Anpassung der Zeichnungsberechtigung aufgrund geänderter Eintragungspraxis].
Publication number: HR02-1005505404, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Skilift AG, Oberhelfenschwil, in Oberhelfenschwil, CHE-102.566.572, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 56 vom 21.03.2019, Publ. 1004593063).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Anderegg, Werner, von Neckertal, in Oberhelfenschwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Eugster, Remo, von Altstätten, in Oberhelfenschwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.