Reports for Swiss Steel Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Swiss Steel Holding AG
- Swiss Steel Holding AG has its legal headquarters in Emmenbrücke and is active. It operates in the sector «Business management and administration».
- Swiss Steel Holding AG has 15 persons entered in its management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 28.08.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company Swiss Steel Holding AG is registered under the UID CHE-101.417.171.
- company Swiss Steel Holding AG has 4 active trademarks, cancelled trademarks or pending applications.
Management (15)
newest board members
Ing. Karl Haider,
Dr. Rainer Alexander Paul Gut,
Mario Rossi,
David Alexandre Metzger,
Jens Alder
newest authorized signatories
Dr. Rainer Alexander Paul Gut,
Thomas Löhr,
Andres Roger Venzin,
Patrick Lamarque d'Arrouzat,
Jörg Paura
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.09.1887
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.010.656-7
UID/VAT
CHE-101.417.171
Sector
Business management and administration
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Beteiligungen in allen Rechtsformen, insbesondere im Stahlbereich; Beteiligungen an Handels-, Industrie- und Dienstleistungsunternehmen sowie an Holdinggesellschaften im In- und Ausland; Erwerb, Belastung und Veräusserung von Grundeigentum.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | 27.05.2005 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Luzern | <2004 | 26.05.2005 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Swiss Steel Holding Ltd.
- Swiss Steel Holding SA
- SCHMOLZ+BICKENBACH SA
- SCHMOLZ+BICKENBACH Ltd.
- SCHMOLZ+BICKENBACH AG
- Swiss Steel AG
- von Moos Holding AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
27.12.2022 | active | 16513/2022 | |
11.05.2022 | active | 06309/2022 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Swiss Steel Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006116004, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Swiss Steel Holding AG, in Luzern, CHE-101.417.171, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 146 vom 30.07.2024, Publ. 1006096829).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schwarzkopf, Dr. Michael, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Reutte (AT), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Weissenbacher, Emese, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Bietigheim-Bissingen (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Portmann, Marco, von Escholzmatt-Marbach, in Risch, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gut, Alexander, von Reiden, in Maur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Haider, Karl, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Puchenau (AT), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Löhr, Thomas, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Castrop-Rauxel (DE), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006096829, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Swiss Steel Holding AG, in Luzern, CHE-101.417.171, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 101 vom 28.05.2024, Publ. 1006041265).
Domizil neu:
Werkstrasse 7, 6020 Emmenbrücke.
Publication number: HR02-1006041265, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Swiss Steel Holding AG, in Luzern, CHE-101.417.171, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 81 vom 26.04.2024, Publ. 1006018715).
Statutenänderung:
23.05.2024.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 492'788'608.00 [bisher: CHF 492'788'597.68].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 492'788'608.00 [bisher: CHF 492'788'597.68].
Aktien neu:
30'799'288 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 16.00 [bisher: 6'159'857'471 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 0.08]. Ordentliche Kapitalerhöhung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.