Address
c/o Sika Schweiz AG, Zweigniederlassung Sarnen
Industriestrasse 26
6060 Sarnen
Reports for Sarna Jubiläums-Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Sarna Jubiläums-Stiftung
- Sarna Jubiläums-Stiftung has its legal headquarters in Sarnen and is active. It operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The management has 6 active persons registered.
- The organization has last modified its commercial register entry on 24.05.2022. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-102.077.528.
- There are 3 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Sika Manufacturing AG, Sika Schweiz AG, Zweigniederlassung Sarnen, Sika Supply Center AG.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Josef Dönni,
Pia Maria Burch-Fenk,
Dr. Marius Christoph Risi,
Karl Josef Lutz,
Urs Ehrenzeller
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.12.1984
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Sarnen
Commercial Registry Office
OW
Commercial register number
CH-140.7.000.885-8
UID/VAT
CHE-102.077.528
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Förderung kultureller Bestrebungen, namentlich aber nicht ausschliesslich in der Innerschweiz und besonders im Kanton Obwalden.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
GFA Gesellschaft für Abschlussrevisionen AG | Hergiswil (NW) | 28.08.2019 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Arttreuhand AG | Kriens | 05.06.2015 | 27.08.2019 | |
Gemperli Treuhand AG | Sarnen | 19.04.2007 | 04.06.2015 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Sarna-Jubiläumsstiftung
- Sarna Jubiläumsstiftung
- Sarna-Jubiläumsstiftung.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Sarna Jubiläums-Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005480695, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Sarna Jubiläums-Stiftung, in Sarnen, CHE-102.077.528, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 134 vom 14.07.2020, Publ. 1004936398).
Aufsichtsbehörde neu:
Zentralschweizer BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht (ZBSA), in Luzern.
Publication number: HR02-1004936398, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Sarna Jubiläums-Stiftung, in Sarnen, CHE-102.077.528, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 167 vom 30.08.2019, Publ. 1004706028).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
von Wyl, Beat, von Sarnen, in Sarnen, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit einem Mitglied.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Burch-Fenk, Pia, von Sarnen, in Sarnen, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit einem Mitglied];
Dönni, Josef, von Wolfenschiessen, in Alpnach, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004706028, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Sarna-Jubiläumsstiftung, in Sarnen, CHE-102.077.528, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 165 vom 28.08.2019, Publ. 1004704137).
Name neu:
Sarna Jubiläums-Stiftung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.