Reports for Ricardo AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Ricardo AG
- Ricardo AG with its legal headquarters in Zug is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Data processing and hosting services». Ricardo AG is active.
- The management of the company Ricardo AG consists of 7 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 19.05.1999.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 31.07.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is CHE-108.695.363.
- At the moment, the company Ricardo AG has 12 various trademarks or applications in the IPI database.
- EP Commodities, a.s., Prag, Zweigniederlassung Zug, EP Resources AG, Eurex Global Derivatives AG have the same address as Ricardo AG.
Management (7)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Nicole Cornelia Lyrenmann,
Francesco Pietro Vass,
Boris Gussen,
Hannes Neunhaeuserer,
Priska Cavelti-Heger
Executive board
Francesco Pietro Vass,
Hannes Neunhaeuserer,
Priska Cavelti-Heger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.05.1999
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zug
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.021.824-1
UID/VAT
CHE-108.695.363
CHE-143.883.461 VAT
Sector
Data processing and hosting services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Durchführen von Auktionen auf dem Internet und Erbringen von Dienstleistungen im Internet; kann Finanzierungen, einschliesslich die Gewährung von Darlehen, für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Sicherungsgeschäfte, einschliesslich Garantien, Pfandbestellungen, Globalzessionen, Sicherungsübereignungen, Sicherungsabtretungen und Schadloserklärungen, für verbunden Unternehmen und Dritte eingehen, auch wenn diese Rechtsgeschäfte in deren ausschliesslichem Interesse liegen, sich bei anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder errichten sowie Liegenschaften und Wertschriften erwerben, verwalten und verkaufen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | Zürich | 31.07.2024 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zug | 15.12.2008 | 30.07.2024 | |
KPMG AG | Zug | 27.12.2007 | 14.12.2008 | |
Wirtschafts-Treuhand AG | Basel | 14.01.2005 | 26.12.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Ricardo Ltd
- Ricardo SA
- ricardo.ch AG
- ricardo.ch Ltd
- ricardo.ch SA
- Auktion24 AG
- ComputerExpress.ch AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
11.02.2021 | active | 04310/2020 | |
Camp Forward | 11.09.2020 | active | 04309/2020 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Ricardo AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006097891, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Ricardo AG, in Zug, CHE-108.695.363, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 55 vom 19.03.2024, Publ. 1005988968).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG (CHE-254.525.813), in Zug, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
KPMG AG (CHE-106.084.881), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005988968, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Ricardo AG, in Zug, CHE-108.695.363, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 74 vom 18.04.2023, Publ. 1005726189).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lyrenmann, Nicole, von Bachenbülach, in Bachenbülach, Zeichnungsberechtigte, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005726189, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Ricardo AG, in Zug, CHE-108.695.363, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 191 vom 03.10.2022, Publ. 1005573826).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Despas, Gilles Antoine Jacques, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gussen, Boris, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Muri bei Bern, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Vass, Francesco, von Lugano, in Küsnacht (ZH), Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Cavelti, Priska, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Küssnacht (SZ), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Bern, Zeichnungsberechtigte, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Neunhaeuserer, Hannes, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Meilen, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Deck, Andreas, von Zürich, in Wollerau, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Stamm, Philipp Paul, von Schleitheim, in Zollikon, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.