Reports for Pro Senectute
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Pro Senectute
- Pro Senectute from Zürich operates in the sector «Other social services» and is active.
- The management has 15 active persons registered.
- The organization has last modified its commercial register entry on 30.05.2023. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The organization's UID is CHE-105.827.378.
Management (15)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Beata Studer-Lenzlinger,
Gabriele Plüss-Schneider,
André Rudolf Schläfli,
Alenka Sylvie Bonnard,
Rosmarie Quadranti-Stahel
Executive board
Jörg Auf der Maur,
Alexander Martin Widmer,
Sonja Regula Kuchen,
Alain Huber
newest authorized signatories
Jörg Auf der Maur,
André Rudolf Schläfli,
Beda Krähenmann,
Alexander Martin Widmer,
Sonja Regula Kuchen
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.04.1921
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.903.187-2
UID/VAT
CHE-105.827.378
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Stiftung ist, das Wohl der älteren Menschen in der Schweiz zu erhalten und zu heben. Zusammen mit anderen privaten oder mit öffentlichen Institutionen kann die Stiftung auch zum Wohl anderer Bevölkerungsgruppen beitragen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | Zürich | 14.10.2016 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Zürich | 07.01.2011 | 13.10.2016 | |
Ernst & Young AG | Bern | 11.04.2007 | 06.01.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Pro Senectute -Per la Vegliadetgna
- Pro Senectute -Pour la Vieillesse
- Pro Senectute -Per la Vecchiaia
- Pro Senectute - Für das Alter
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Pro Senectute
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005755511, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 94 vom 16.05.2023 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 19655 vom 11.05.2023 Pro Senectute, in Zürich, CHE-105.827.378, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 94 vom 16.05.2023, Publ. 1005746977).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Auf der Maur, Jörg, von Schwyz, in Galgenen, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [nicht: in Wangen (SZ)].
Publication number: HR02-1005746977, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Pro Senectute, in Zürich, CHE-105.827.378, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 163 vom 24.08.2022, Publ. 1005546311).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bösch, Urs, von Meilen, in Zürich, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Auf der Maur, Jörg, von Schwyz, in Wangen (SZ), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005546311, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Pro Senectute, in Zürich, CHE-105.827.378, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 232 vom 29.11.2021, Publ. 1005344094).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Dietschi, Peter, von Laupersdorf, in Meggen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hobor, Thomas, von Bischofszell, in Bischofszell, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Krähenmann, Beda, von Tobel-Tägerschen und Aadorf, in Savosa, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Plüss, Gabriele, von Lenzburg, in Oberägeri, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Studer-Lenzlinger, Beata, von St. Gallen, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.