Reports for Blink AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Blink AG
- Blink AG in Bern is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Other services in education». Blink AG is active.
- There are 4 active persons registered in the management.
- On the 03.11.2023 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-427.177.544.
- Apostroph Bern AG, Arte cucina Manz-Ritz SA, China Swiss Investment AG are registered at the same address.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Arben Lekaj,
Christian Hofer,
Tobias Schmoker,
Christoph Häberli
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.01.2015
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.4.062.651-0
UID/VAT
CHE-427.177.544
CHE-368.443.458 VAT
Sector
Other services in education
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb einer Fahrschule sowie alle damit direkt oder indirekt zusammenhängenden Tätigkeiten. Dazu gehören unter anderem die Vergabe von Lizenzen an Franchisingpartner, die Durchführung von Kursen, die Erstellung und der Vertrieb von Software im Fahrschulbereich sowie die Vermietung von Autos und Räumlichkeiten. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Grimm + Ruchti Treuhand AG | Burgdorf | 27.06.2022 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- nohe Schweiz GmbH
- nohe Schweiz Sàrl
- nohe Schweiz Ltd liab. Co
- nohe Schweiz Sagl
- Lekaj & Gysi Ltd liab. Co
- Lekaj & Gysi Sàrl
- Lekaj & Gysi Sagl
- Lekaj & Gysi GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
Wüthrich | 22.11.2023 | active | 10655/2023 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Blink AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005875980, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Blink AG, in Bern, CHE-427.177.544, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 164 vom 25.08.2023, Publ. 1005823533).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Domenig, Benjamin, von Tamins, in Bern, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Köpp, Sebastian Niklaus, von Herdern, in Thun, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lekaj, Arben, von Matten bei Interlaken, in Bern, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005823533, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Blink AG, in Bern, CHE-427.177.544, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 61 vom 28.03.2023, Publ. 1005710611).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Domenig, Benjamin, von Tamins, in Bern, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied und Sekretär des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Hofer, Christian, von Jegenstorf, in Bern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Köpp, Sebastian Niklaus, von Herdern, in Thun, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005710611, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Blink AG, in Bern, CHE-427.177.544, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 23 vom 02.02.2023, Publ. 1005667826).
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und Passiven der Fahrschule Forster GmbH, in Münchenstein (CHE-210.895.251), gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 14.03.2023 und Bilanz per 31.12.2022. Aktiven von CHF 87'424.81 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 76'464.13 gehen auf die übernehmende Gesellschaft über. Da dieselbe Aktionärin bzw. Gesellschafterin sämtliche Aktien und Stammanteile der an der Fusion beteiligten Gesellschaften hält, findet weder eine Kapitalerhöhung noch eine Aktienzuteilung statt.
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und Passiven der Fahrschule Wüthrich AG, in Bettlach (CHE-340.467.050), gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 14.03.2023 und Bilanz per 31.12.2022. Aktiven von CHF 650'520.60 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 58'860.65 gehen auf die übernehmende Gesellschaft über. Da dieselbe Aktionärin sämtliche Aktien der an der Fusion beteiligten Gesellschaften hält, findet weder eine Kapitalerhöhung noch eine Aktienzuteilung statt.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.