Head office
Other branches (61)
Reports for Manpower SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Manpower SA
- Manpower SA has its legal headquarters in Luzern and is active. It is a Branch with head office in Switzerland and active in the industry «Temp agency services».
- Manpower SA has 2 persons entered in its management.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 18.12.2023. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of LU under the UID CHE-223.448.849.
- Companies with the same address as Manpower SA: African Parks Stiftung Schweiz, albert ag, anro group GmbH.
Management (2)
For the supreme institution of the company, please look at the head office
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.10.1997
Legal form
Branch with head office in Switzerland
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.9.020.445-8
UID/VAT
CHE-223.448.849
CHE-116.287.902 VAT
Sector
Temp agency services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Suche, Selektion, Beratung und Schulung von Personal, Zurverfügungstellung von Personal für Fest-, Temporär- und Teilzeitstellen, Uebernahme und Management des Personals auf Antrag, Lohnverwaltung sowie alle Arbeiten, die mit Outsourcing-Verträgen in Verbindung stehen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Manpower Ltd
- Manpower AG
- Manpower SpA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Manpower SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005912365, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Manpower SA, in Luzern, CHE-223.448.849, schweizerische Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 185 vom 23.09.2022, Publ. 1005567795).
Hauptsitz in:
Morges.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Unternährer, Peter, von Romoos, in Ruswil, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bieri, Carmen, von Flühli, in Sursee, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005567795, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Manpower SA, in Luzern, CHE-223.448.849, schweizerische Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 42 vom 02.03.2021, Publ. 1005113116).
Hauptsitz in:
Morges.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Huber, Walter, von Nottwil und Sursee, in Wauwil, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Felder, Roland, von Kriens und Entlebuch, in Schötz, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005113116, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Manpower SA, in Luzern, CHE-223.448.849, schweizerische Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 29 vom 11.02.2021, Publ. 1005097868).
Hauptsitz in:
Morges.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wernas, Olaf, niederländischer Staatsangehöriger, in Luzern, Leiter der Zweigniederlassung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Greter, Werner, von Greppen, in Emmen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Huber, Walter, von Nottwil und Sursee, in Wauwil, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Unternährer, Peter, von Romoos, in Ruswil, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.