Reports for Les Editions de la Salamandre Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Les Editions de la Salamandre Sàrl
- Les Editions de la Salamandre Sàrl in Neuchâtel is a Limited liability company from the sector «Operation of a publishing agency (analog/digital)». Les Editions de la Salamandre Sàrl is active.
- The management of the company Les Editions de la Salamandre Sàrl consists of 3 persons.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 09.07.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register NE under the UID CHE-106.823.791.
- The company Les Editions de la Salamandre Sàrl has currently registered 7 different trademarks or applications for trademarks.
- Next to the company Les Editions de la Salamandre Sàrl there are 2 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Association des Amis de La Salamandre, ELKA Watch Co. Sàrl.
Management (3)
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Baptiste Gérémie Pfeiffer,
Mélanie Schafter Contini,
Julien Louis Perrot
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.08.1995
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Neuchâtel
Commercial Registry Office
NE
Commercial register number
CH-645.1.001.857-5
UID/VAT
CHE-106.823.791
Sector
Operation of a publishing agency (analog/digital)
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Sans poursuivre de but lucratif, la société entend faire découvrir, aimer et respecter la nature. Pour atteindre ce but idéal, elle édite des revues et des livres, elle produit et diffuse des films et des contenus numériques et organise des événements de sensibilisation et d'éveil à la nature, destinés aux enfants et aux adultes.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Vigilis SA | La Chaux-de-Fonds | 07.03.2018 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Soresa SA | La Chaux-de-Fonds | 18.11.2014 | 06.03.2018 | |
Fiduciaire Leitenberg & Associés SA | La Chaux-de-Fonds | 28.05.2008 | 17.11.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Les Editions Naturelles Sàrl
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
25.01.2023 | active | 13185/2022 | |
11.08.2021 | active | 12269/2021 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Les Editions de la Salamandre Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006080083, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Les Editions de la Salamandre Sàrl, à Neuchâtel, CHE-106.823.791 (FOSC du 11.07.2023, p. 0/1005792941). Perrot Julien, associé, a cédé 1 de ses 92 parts sociales de CHF 1'000 à l'associé Pfeiffer Baptiste Gérémie, lequel est désormais titulaire de 9 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.
Publication number: HR02-1005792941, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Les Editions de la Salamandre Sàrl, à Neuchâtel, CHE-106.823.791 (FOSC du 21.06.2022, p. 0/1005500888). L'associé Perrot Julien a cédé 1 de ses 93 parts sociales de CHF 1'000 à l'associé Pfeiffer Baptiste Gérémie, lequel est désormais titulaire de 8 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.
Publication number: HR02-1005500888, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Les Editions de la Salamandre Sàrl, à Neuchâtel, CHE-106.823.791 (FOSC du 02.03.2022, p. 0/1005418483). Perrot Julien a cédé 1 de ses 94 parts sociales de CHF 1'000 à l'associé Pfeiffer Baptiste Gérémie, lequel est désormais titulaire de 7 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.