Reports for HAWE Hydraulik Schweiz AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout HAWE Hydraulik Schweiz AG
- HAWE Hydraulik Schweiz AG in Perlen is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Trading with machines». HAWE Hydraulik Schweiz AG is active.
- HAWE Hydraulik Schweiz AG was founded on 18.08.1960.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 11.01.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of LU under the UID CHE-107.913.712.
Management (6)
newest board members
Sebastian Brand,
Wolfgang Dieter Sochor,
Jiang Ye,
Udo Wolter
newest authorized signatories
Sebastian Brand,
Wolfgang Dieter Sochor,
Jiang Ye,
Udo Wolter,
René Burri
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.08.1960
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Buchrain
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-120.3.000.484-2
UID/VAT
CHE-107.913.712
Sector
Trading with machines
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit elektrotechnischen und maschinentechnischen Produkten namentlich im Bereich Hydraulik und Antriebstechnik, Erbringung damit zusammenhängender Dienstleistungen, Entwicklung und fabrikmässige Fertigung von technischen Produkten sowie Uebernahme von Handelsvertretungen; kann Grundstücke und Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, halten oder verwerten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen oder solche übernehmen und errichten sowie Gesellschaften des HAWE Konzerns unterstützen, insbesondere in finanzieller Hinsicht, unter anderem durch die Gewährung und Vermittlung von Krediten, Bürgschaften, Garantien oder anderer Sicherheiten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Luzern | 23.12.2016 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | Zürich | 08.11.2013 | 22.12.2016 | |
Multimax Suisse AG | Alpnach | 05.01.2011 | 07.11.2013 | |
Beeler + Beeler Revisions AG | Risch | <2004 | 22.12.2005 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- HAWE Hydraulik Switzerland LTD
- HAWE Hydraulik Suisse SA
- HAWE - HYDRATEC AG
- HAWE -HYDRATEC LTD
- HAWE -HYDRATEC SA
- HYDRATEC Hydraulik + Antriebs - Technik AG
- Hainzl Industriesysteme AG
- Heinzl Industriesysteme AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: HAWE Hydraulik Schweiz AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005931506, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 250 vom 27.12.2023, publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 11249 vom 20.12.2023 HAWE Hydraulik Schweiz AG, in Buchrain, CHE-107.913.712, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 250 vom 27.12.2023, Publ. 1005919973).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ye, Jiang, chinesischer Staatsangehöriger, in Grünwald (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [nicht: in Grünwald (CN)].
Publication number: HR02-1005919973, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
HAWE - HYDRATEC AG, in Buchrain, CHE-107.913.712, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 70 vom 12.04.2023, Publ. 1005721451).
Statutenänderung:
13.12.2023.
Firma neu:
HAWE Hydraulik Schweiz AG.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(HAWE Hydraulik Suisse SA) (HAWE Hydraulik Switzerland LTD).
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen erfolgen brieflich oder per E-Mail. [Weitere Änderungen berühren keine publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schullan, Robert Axel, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Hoechstadt/Aisch (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Unterstein, Markus, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Garching (DE), Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sochor, Wolfgang Dieter, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Stötten (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Brand, Sebastian, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Königsbrunn (DE), Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ye, Jiang, chinesischer Staatsangehöriger, in Grünwald (CN), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.