Reports for Bender Immo SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Bender Immo SA
- Bender Immo SA is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Martigny. Bender Immo SA belongs to the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active.
- The management of the company Bender Immo SA consists of one person.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 05.12.2022.
- The company is registered in the commercial register VS under the UID CHE-105.760.567.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.02.1975
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Martigny
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.3.000.102-9
UID/VAT
CHE-105.760.567
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but l'acquisition, la vente, l'échange, la location, la construction, le financement, l'exploitation et la gérance d'immeubles, avec ou sans accessoires. Elle peut effectuer toute opération financière ou commerciale en rapport direct ou indirect avec son but ou apte à le favoriser. Elle peut en outre créer des succursales en Suisse et à l'étranger, prendre des participations, fonder ou financer des entreprises ayant un rapport direct ou indirect avec son but.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
MHR Révision S.A. | Morges | 22.07.2009 | 28.07.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Fiduciaire Bender SA
- Fiduciaire Laurent & Benoît Bender SA
- Fiduciaire Bender Laurent & Benoît SA
- Fiduciaire Bender Laurent SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Bender Immo SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005619976, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Fiduciaire Bender SA, à Martigny, CHE-105.760.567, société anonyme (No. FOSC 220 du 11.11.2022, Publ. 1005602773).
Modification des statuts:
16.11.2022.
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Bender Immo SA.
Nouveau but:
La société a pour but l'acquisition, la vente, l'échange, la location, la construction, le financement, l'exploitation et la gérance d'immeubles, avec ou sans accessoires. Elle peut effectuer toute opération financière ou commerciale en rapport direct ou indirect avec son but ou apte à le favoriser. Elle peut en outre créer des succursales en Suisse et à l'étranger, prendre des participations, fonder ou financer des entreprises ayant un rapport direct ou indirect avec son but.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Bender, Delphine, de Fully, à Fully, avec procuration collective à deux mais pas avec un autre fondé de procuration;
Morard, Thomas, de Lens, à Sion, avec procuration collective à deux mais pas avec un autre fondé de procuration.
Publication number: HR02-1005455785, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Fiduciaire Bender SA, à Martigny, CHE-105.760.567, société anonyme (No. FOSC 15 du 22.01.2016, p.0, Publ. 2614465).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Bender, Laurent, de Fully, à Martigny, administrateur, secrétaire, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Bender, Benoît, de Fully, à Martigny, administrateur unique, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: président, avec signature individuelle];
Bender, Delphine, de Fully, à Fully, avec procuration collective à deux mais pas avec un autre fondé de procuration [précédemment: sans fonction inscrite, avec procuration collective à deux avec le président ou le secrétaire];
Morard, Thomas, de Lens, à Sion, avec procuration collective à deux mais pas avec un autre fondé de procuration [précédemment: sans fonction inscrite, avec procuration collective à deux avec le président ou le secrétaire].
Publication number: 5798114, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Fiduciaire Laurent & Benoît Bender SA, à Martigny, CH-621.3.000.102-9, société anonyme (FOSC no 144 du 29.07.2009, p. 26, publ. 5166850).
Inscription ou modification de personne:
Bender, Delphine, de Fully, à Fully, avec procuration collective à deux avec le président ou le secrétaire.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.