Reports for Inno-Hill AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Inno-Hill AG
- Inno-Hill AG has its legal headquarters in Kilchberg ZH and is active. It operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management of the company Inno-Hill AG consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 04.02.1970.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 06.12.2022, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-105.901.980.
- On the same address there are 6 other active companies registered. These include: epag Energieplanung AG, Esro AG, Event Service GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.02.1970
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Kilchberg (ZH)
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.908.140-8
UID/VAT
CHE-105.901.980
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, das Halten und Verwalten von Immobilien im In- und Ausland. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen auf eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fleischmann Consulting GmbH | Wollerau | 05.10.2016 | 05.12.2022 | |
Promit Treuhand AG | Thalwil | 08.12.1994 | 14.01.2013 |
Other company names
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Inno-Hill AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005620140, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Esro AG, in Kilchberg (ZH), CHE-105.901.980, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 193 vom 05.10.2016, S.0, Publ. 3089887).
Statutenänderung:
25.11.2022.
Vermögensübertragung:
Die Gesellschaft überträgt gemäss Vertrag vom 25.11.2022 Aktiven von CHF 2'818'637.01 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 887'432.94 auf die Esro AG, in Kilchberg (ZH) (CHE-156.824.930).
Gegenleistung:
950 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 der Esro AG und Gutschrift von CHF 981'204.07.
Firma neu:
Inno-Hill AG.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, das Halten und Verwalten von Immobilien im In- und Ausland. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen auf eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft erfolgen durch Brief oder E-Mail an die Adressen der im Aktienbuch eingetragenen Aktionäre. Gemäss Erklärung vom 02.11.2022 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fleischmann Consulting GmbH (CHE-108.581.601), in Wollerau, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hostettler, Claudio, von Winterthur, in Thalwil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Hostettler, Claudio Rafael];
Sutter, Patrick, von Fulenbach, in Niederrohrdorf, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Sutter, Patrick Daniel].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.