Reports for Entec Messtechnik GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Entec Messtechnik GmbH
- Entec Messtechnik GmbH is a Limited liability company with its legal headquarters in Augst BL. Entec Messtechnik GmbH belongs to the industry «Trading with machines» and is currently active.
- The company was founded on 29.12.1995.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 09.11.2022.
- In the commercial register the company Entec Messtechnik GmbH is registered under the UID CHE-103.426.867.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.12.1995
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Augst
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.4.900.131-6
UID/VAT
CHE-103.426.867
Sector
Trading with machines
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist Handel mit, Dienstleistungen an und Fabrikation von messtechnischen Geräten sowie deren lm- und Export.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Entec Messtechnik GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005600448, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Entec Messtechnik GmbH, in Pratteln, CHE-103.426.867, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 6 vom 12.01.2009, S.6, Publ. 4819676).
Statutenänderung:
31.10.2022.
Sitz neu:
Augst.
Domizil neu:
Giebenacherstrasse 4, 4302 Augst BL.
Zweck neu:
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist Handel mit, Dienstleistungen an und Fabrikation von messtechnischen Geräten sowie deren lm- und Export.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Bekanntmachungen an die im Anteilbuch eingetragenen Gesellschafter erfolgen - soweit das Gesetz nicht etwas anderes zwingend bestimmt - durch gewöhnlichen oder eingeschriebenen Brief. [Zweck: Änderung von Amtes wegen aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Käfer, Dieter, von Bretzwil, in Pratteln, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 21'000.00 [bisher: deutscher Staatsangehöriger].
Publication number: 4819676, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Entec Messtechnik GmbH, in Pratteln, CH-280.4.900.131-6, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 3 vom 05.01.2001, S. 95). Gemäss Erklärung der Geschäftsführung vom 29.12.2008 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf die Durchführung einer eingeschränkten Revision.
Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Entec Messtechnik GmbH, in P r a t t e l n , Handel mit, Dienstleistungen an und Fabrikation von messtechnischen Geräten, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 8 vom 12.01.1996, S. 233).
Statutenänderung:
22.12.2000.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kopp-Resch, Rolf, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Müllheim (D), Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 7'000.-;
Wetter, Hans, von Appenzell, in Basel, Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 7'000.-.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Käfer, Dieter, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Pratteln, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 21'000.- [bisher: mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 7'000.-].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.