Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Address
c/o Reichlin Hess AG
Landis + Gyr-Strasse 1
6300 Zug
Reports for Dow Internationaler Pensionsplan IPP in Liquidation
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.01.1987
Deletion from the commercial register
28.11.2022
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Zug
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.7.000.417-4
UID/VAT
CHE-109.624.897
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Gewährt Mitarbeitern der Dow-Gruppe, welche im Zuge ihrer beruflichen Laufbahn bei mehr als einem Land angestellt sind, einen heinheitlichen Anspruch auf Vorsorge bei Alter, Tod, Invalidität.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PK-Revision AG | Zürich | 06.06.2016 | 27.11.2022 | |
Fidartis Revisions AG | Zürich | 10.11.2008 | 05.06.2016 | |
Rudolf Blättler dipl. Bücherexperte | Schwerzenbach | 23.11.2006 | 09.11.2008 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Dow Internationaler Pensionsplan IPP
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Dow Internationaler Pensionsplan IPP in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1005614042, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Dow Internationaler Pensionsplan IPP in Liquidation, in Zug, CHE-109.624.897, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 154 vom 11.08.2021, Publ. 1005268793). Die Aufsichtsbehörde hat mit Verfügung vom 09.06.2022 die ordnungsgemässe Liquidation festgestellt. Die Stiftung wird gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1005268793, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Dow Internationaler Pensionsplan IPP, in Zug, CHE-109.624.897, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 178 vom 14.09.2020, Publ. 1004977884).
Name neu:
Dow Internationaler Pensionsplan IPP in Liquidation. Die Stiftung ist gemäss Verfügung der Zentralschweizer BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht (ZBSA) vom 11.06.2021 aufgehoben.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Floristan Pena, Carmen Maria, von Feusisberg, in Feusisberg, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, Liquidatorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Jendretzke, Bryan, amerikanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Midland (US), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Just, Thomas Wagner, dänischer Staatsangehöriger, in Wädenswil, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Sykes, Peter, britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Tokyo (JP), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 3502605, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Dow Internationaler Pensionsplan IPP, in Zug, CHE-109.624.897, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 107 vom 06.06.2016, Publ. 2871359).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Roane Ricci, Valeria, italienische Staatsangehörige, in Horgen, Zeichnungsberechtigte, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.