Reports for DLC Aviatik AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout DLC Aviatik AG
- DLC Aviatik AG has its legal headquarters in Scherz, is active and operates in the sector «Operation of other financial institutions».
- The management of the company DLC Aviatik AG, which was founded on the 31.01.2000, consists of one person.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 06.11.2023.
- The company's UID is CHE-100.708.476.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
31.01.2000
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Lupfig
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.023.581-3
UID/VAT
CHE-100.708.476
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Halten und den Betrieb sowie die Vermietung und die Vercharterung von Flugzeugen aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften der Tochtergesellschaften und Dritten eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
OBT AG | Berikon | 05.12.2005 | 21.08.2011 | |
Walter Benz | Döttingen | <2004 | 04.12.2005 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Display LC Europe AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: DLC Aviatik AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005877557, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
DLC Aviatik AG, in Gebenstorf, CHE-100.708.476, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 167 vom 30.08.2018, Publ. 4443947).
Statutenänderung:
25.10.2023.
Sitz neu:
Lupfig.
Domizil neu:
Hauserstrasse 271, 5246 Scherz.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Halten und den Betrieb sowie die Vermietung und die Vercharterung von Flugzeugen aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften der Tochtergesellschaften und Dritten eingehen.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Brief oder elektronische Post rechtsgültig an die letzte der Gesellschaft gemeldete Adresse.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Huwiler, Björg, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Turgi, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: 4443947, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
DLC Aviatik AG, in Gebenstorf, CHE-100.708.476, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 81 vom 29.04.2014, Publ. 1475295). [Gemeindefusion vom 01.01.2018].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Erismann, Alex, von Zürich und Beinwil am See, in Lupfig, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Zürich und Beinwil am See, in Scherz].
Publication number: 1475295, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Display LC Europe AG, in Gebenstorf, CHE-100.708.476, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 161 vom 22.08.2011, Publ. 6303168).
Statutenänderung:
10.04.2014.
Firma neu:
DLC Aviatik AG.
Zweck neu:
Halten und Betrieb sowie Vermietung und Vercharterung von Flugzeugen aller Art;
kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.