Reports for CHEZ SIMON SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout CHEZ SIMON SA
- CHEZ SIMON SA with its legal headquarters in Riddes is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of restaurants». CHEZ SIMON SA is active.
- The management of the company CHEZ SIMON SA, which was founded on the 02.02.2005, consists of 4 persons.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 29.05.2009.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-112.217.127.
Management (4)
newest board members
Christophe Laurenti,
Simon Laurenti,
Monique Laurenti-Crettenand,
Tatiana Laurenti
newest authorized signatories
Christophe Laurenti,
Simon Laurenti,
Monique Laurenti-Crettenand,
Tatiana Laurenti
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.02.2005
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Riddes
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.3.006.899-7
UID/VAT
CHE-112.217.127
Sector
Operation of restaurants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'un café-restaurant et de tout autre établissement privé ou public; commerce de vins ainsi que toutes activités convergentes à ses buts y compris immobilières.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
RS Fiduciaire Générale SA en liquidation | Sion | 08.02.2005 | 28.05.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: CHEZ SIMON SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5042974, Commercial Registry Office Valais
CHEZ SIMON SA, à Riddes, CH-621.3.006.899-7, société anonyme (FOSC no 27 du 08.02.2005, p. 17, publ. 2691536).
Modification des statuts:
19.05.2009.
Communications aux actionnaires:
par avis inséré dans la FOSC ou avis personnel pour les convocations aux AG. Statuts adaptés au nouveau droit. Selon déclaration des administrateurs du 19.05.2009, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Personne et signature radiée:
RS Fiduciaire Générale SA, à Sion, organe de révision.
Publication number: 2691536, Commercial Registry Office Valais
CHEZ SIMON SA, à Riddes, CH-621.3.006.899-7, Pied du Mont 3, 1908 Riddes, nouvelle société anonyme.
Date des statuts:
18.01.2005, 1.02.2005.
But:
exploitation d'un café-restaurant et de tout autre établissement privé ou public;
commerce de vins ainsi que toutes activités convergentes à ses buts y compris immobilières.
Capital-actions:
CHF 100'000.--, entièrement libéré.
Actions:
100 actions de CHF 1'000.-- nominatives avec clause d'agrément.
Faits qualifiés:
apport en nature et reprise de biens: selon contrat du 14.01.2005 et inventaire, sont apportés à la société pour un total de CHF 133'000.- un stock de marchandises, des machines et du matériel professionnels, deux motoluges Bearcat wide track, un bus VW 4x4;
apports acceptés pour ce prix, en échange duquel sont remises aux fondateurs les 100 actions de CHF 1'000.- qui constituent le capital, le solde de CHF 33'000.- étant inscrit au passif du bilan en faveur de l'apporteur.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Personnes inscrites:
Laurenti, Simon, de Riddes, à Riddes, président, avec signature collective à deux;
Laurenti, Christophe, de Riddes, à Riddes, administrateur et secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux;
Laurenti née Crettenand, Monique, de Riddes, à Riddes, administratrice, avec signature collective à deux;
Laurenti, Tatiana, de Riddes, à Riddes, administratrice, avec signature collective à deux;
RS Fiduciaire Générale SA, à Sion, organe de révision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.