Reports for Carpe Domus AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Carpe Domus AG
- Carpe Domus AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Schwarzenbach SG. Carpe Domus AG belongs to the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active.
- Carpe Domus AG was founded on 22.12.2010.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 19.06.2013.
- The company's UID is CHE-185.683.525.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.12.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Jonschwil
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.068.378-9
UID/VAT
CHE-185.683.525
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Kauft, baut, verkauft und verwaltet Immobilien aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten sowie sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Carpe Domus AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 925887, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Carpe Domus AG, in Wil SG, CH-320.3.068.378-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 86 vom 03.05.2012, Publ. 6664594).
Statutenänderung:
06.06.2013.
Sitz neu:
Jonschwil.
Domizil neu:
Wilerstrasse 7a, 9536 Schwarzenbach.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 150'000.00 [bisher: CHF 100'000.00].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 150'000.00 [bisher: CHF 100'000.00].
Aktien neu:
150 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00. [bisher: 100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00]. Ordentliche Erhöhung des Aktienkapitals.
Publication number: 6664594, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Carpe Domus AG, in Wil SG, CH-320.3.068.378-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 253 vom 28.12.2010, S. 20, Publ. 5963480).
Domizil neu:
Zürcherstrasse 17, 9500 Wil.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schönenberger, Simon, von Bütschwil, in Wilen bei Wil (Wilen TG), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Giovanettoni, Donato Antonio Lorenzo, von Gommiswald, in Herdern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 5963480, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Carpe Domus AG, in Wil SG, CH-320.3.068.378-9, Thuraustrasse 2, 9500 Wil , Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
17.12.2010.
Zweck:
Kauft, baut, verkauft und verwaltet Immobilien aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten sowie sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen..
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Die Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Brief an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adresssen..
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 17.12.2010 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Schönenberger, Simon, von Bütschwil, in Wilen bei Wil (Wilen TG), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.