Reports for Sparhafen Immobilien AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Sparhafen Immobilien AG
- Sparhafen Immobilien AG has its legal headquarters in Zürich and is active. It operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management of the company Sparhafen Immobilien AG consists of 12 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 18.06.2004.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 13.09.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company's UID is CHE-111.722.836.
Management (12)
newest board members
Maryann Rohner,
Rolf Schlagenhauf,
lic. iur. Hans Kurt Egloff
newest authorized signatories
Danijela Dimic Jovanovic,
Thomas André Furrer,
Beat W. Christen,
Fabian Daniel Lohner,
Nadine Pletscher
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.06.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.027.828-9
UID/VAT
CHE-111.722.836
CHE-162.666.562 VAT
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Verwaltung, den Kauf, Verkauf, Bau, Umbau sowie die Finanzierung und Vermittlung von Immobilien aller Art. Die Gesellschaft ist im Rahmen ihres Gesellschaftszweckes berechtigt, Unternehmungen zu gründen oder sich daran zu beteiligen. Sie ist befugt, alle Geschäfte zu tätigen, die geeignet sind, die Entwicklung des Unternehmens und die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszweckes zu fördern oder zu erleichtern. Sie kann auch Grundstücke belasten oder beschränkte dingliche Rechte einräumen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
SWA Swiss Auditors AG | Freienbach | 18.08.2020 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | 24.06.2004 | 17.08.2020 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- BSZ Immobilien AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Sparhafen Immobilien AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006128793, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Sparhafen Immobilien AG, in Zürich, CHE-111.722.836, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 29 vom 12.02.2024, Publ. 1005958238).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Merico, Gjada, von Luzern, in Rüschlikon, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005958238, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Sparhafen Immobilien AG, in Zürich, CHE-111.722.836, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 79 vom 25.04.2023, Publ. 1005731172).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dimic Jovanovic, Danijela, von Zürich, in Zürich, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Furrer, Thomas, von Bauma, in Richterswil, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005731172, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Sparhafen Immobilien AG, in Zürich, CHE-111.722.836, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 215 vom 04.11.2022, Publ. 1005597226).
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und Passiven der Sparhafen Immobilien Bewirtschaftung AG, in Zürich (CHE-311.890.630), gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 21.03.2023 und Bilanz per 31.12.2022. Aktiven von CHF 281'000.00 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 258'000.00 gehen auf die übernehmende Gesellschaft über. Gemäss Bestätigung des staatlich beaufsichtigten Revisionsunternehmens liegt frei verwendbares Eigenkapital im Umfang der Unterdeckung der übertragenden Gesellschaft vor. Da die übernehmende Gesellschaft sämtliche Aktien der übertragenden Gesellschaft hält, findet weder eine Kapitalerhöhung noch eine Aktienzuteilung statt.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Christen, Beat, von Hospental, in Zürich, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Lohner, Fabian, von Fischingen, in Geroldswil, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Merico, Gjada, von Luzern, in Rüschlikon, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Pletscher, Nadine, von Schleitheim, in Zürich, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.