Address
c/o Baloise Leben AG
Aeschengraben 21
4051 Basel
Reports for Baloise Sammelstiftung BVG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Baloise Sammelstiftung BVG
- Baloise Sammelstiftung BVG is currently active and the industry «Operation of an pension fund». The legal headquarters are in Basel.
- The management of the organization Baloise Sammelstiftung BVG, which was founded on the 07.11.1994, consists of 15 persons.
- The organization has last modified its commercial register entry on 17.10.2023. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The organization is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of BS under the UID CHE-109.740.084.
- The address is identical with 13 other active companies. These include: Baloise Anlagestiftung für Personalvorsorge, Baloise Asset Management AG, Baloise Asset Management International AG.
Management (15)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Eliane Burn,
Margrit Beeler,
Martin Bärtschi,
Nicole Huber-Bucheli,
Lionel David Dénéréaz
newest authorized signatories
Eliane Burn,
Alexander Dietsche,
Florian Hosch,
Margrit Beeler,
Martin Bärtschi
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.11.1994
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Basel
Commercial Registry Office
BS
Commercial register number
CH-270.7.000.055-5
UID/VAT
CHE-109.740.084
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt die berufliche Vorsorge im Rahmen des BVG und seiner Ausführungsbestimmungen für die Arbeitnehmer der ihr vertraglich angeschlossenen Arbeitgeber sowie für deren Angehörige und Hinterlassene gegen die wirtschaftlichen Folgen von Alter, Tod und Invalidität. Selbstständigerwerbende können sich im Rahmen der BVG-Vorschriften der Vorsorgekasse ihres Personals anschliessen. Die Stiftung kann über die gesetzlichen Mindestleistungen hinausgehende Vorsorge betreiben.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Basel | 11.08.2016 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Basel | 17.05.2006 | 10.08.2016 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Baloise Collective Foundation BVG
- Baloise Fondation collective LPP
- Baloise Fondazione collettiva LPP
- Bâloise-Sammelstiftung für die obligatorische berufliche Vorsorge
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Baloise Sammelstiftung BVG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005862438, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Baloise Sammelstiftung BVG, in Basel, CHE-109.740.084, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 20 vom 30.01.2023, Publ. 1005664596).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Müller, Daniel, von Murgenthal, in Riehen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates (Arbeitgebervertreter), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Burn, Eliane, von Adelboden, in Bern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates (Arbeitgebervertreterin), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005664596, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Baloise Sammelstiftung BVG, in Basel, CHE-109.740.084, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 2 vom 04.01.2023, Publ. 1005643801).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schmidt, Felix, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Kirchzarten (DE), Sekretär (Nichtmitglied), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bärtschi, Martin, von Reinach (BL), in Reinach (BL), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates (Arbeitgebervertreter), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Stiftungsrates (Arbeitgebervertreter), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Rechsteiner, Claudia, von Rehetobel, in Trogen, Vizepräsidentin des Stiftungsrates (Arbeitgebervertreterin), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates (Arbeitgebervertreterin), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Röthlisberger, Ernst, von Langnau im Emmental, in Kölliken, Präsident des Stiftungsrates (Arbeitnehmervertreter), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates (Arbeitnehmervertreter), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Dietsche, Alexander, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Todtnau (DE), Sekretär (Nichtmitglied), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zihlmann, Jürg, von Escholzmatt-Marbach, in Riehen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Marbach (LU)].
Publication number: HR02-1005643801, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Baloise Sammelstiftung BVG, in Basel, CHE-109.740.084, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 196 vom 10.10.2022, Publ. 1005579403).
Domizil neu:
c/o Baloise Leben AG, Aeschengraben 21, 4051 Basel.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.