Branches (3)
Reports for Bächtold & Moor AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Bächtold & Moor AG
- Bächtold & Moor AG is currently active and the industry «Architectural and engineering activities». The legal headquarters are in Bern.
- The company was founded on 03.03.1966.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 14.05.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company's UID is CHE-105.974.720.
- Bächtold & Moor Holding AG, China Cultural Center, Crea Coiffure Beatrice Zucchet are registered at the same address.
Management (13)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Diego Werlen,
Adrian Müller,
Michael Benz,
Adrian Berger,
Alexander Schüpbach
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.03.1966
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.3.012.256-8
UID/VAT
CHE-105.974.720
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Beratung, Planung und Begleitung von Projekten in den Bereichen Bau, Raum und Umwelt. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
T + R AG | Muri bei Bern | 20.06.2007 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Solothurn | <2004 | 19.06.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Bächtold & Moor AG Ingenieure Planer ETH/SIA/usic
- Bächtold AG Ingenieure ETH/SIA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Bächtold & Moor AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006031175, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Bächtold & Moor AG, in Bern, CHE-105.974.720, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 217 vom 08.11.2023, Publ. 1005879354).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Baumberger, Rolf, von Kirchleerau, in Bern, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Meier, Nicolas, von Obersiggenthal, in Bern, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Werlen, Diego, von Bürchen, in Visp, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005879354, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Bächtold & Moor AG, in Bern, CHE-105.974.720, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 168 vom 31.08.2023, Publ. 1005827473).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sennhauser, Ulrich, von Zürich, in Bern, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Jaberg, Peter, von Röthenbach im Emmental, in Kerzers, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Benz, Michael, von Oberriet (SG), in Ringgenberg BE, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Müller, Adrian, von Hasle bei Burgdorf, in Münchenbuchsee, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Berger, Adrian, von Linden, in Riggisberg, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005827473, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Bächtold & Moor AG Ingenieure Planer ETH/SIA/usic, in Bern, CHE-105.974.720, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 211 vom 31.10.2022, Publ. 1005593707).
Statutenänderung:
23.08.2023.
Firma neu:
Bächtold & Moor AG.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Beratung, Planung und Begleitung von Projekten in den Bereichen Bau, Raum und Umwelt. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre: schriftlich oder mit elektronischer Post.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.