Reports for Assurinvest AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Assurinvest AG
- Assurinvest AG from Neuhaus SG operates in the sector «Services regarding management consulting» and is active.
- The company was founded on 13.07.2005 and has 17 persons in its management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 02.07.2024.
- The company is registered in the commercial register SG under the UID CHE-112.445.177.
- There are 4 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: AIA Gruppe AG, Akriba Immobilien - Anlagestiftung, Maria baut AG.
Management (17)
newest board members
Michael Niklaus Schmidt,
Nathalie Glaus Cherella,
Andreas Werner Wolfisberg,
Daniel Alexander Hermann Werdenberg
newest authorized signatories
Michael Niklaus Schmidt,
Lukas Wiede,
Martina Erna Thürig Arnold,
Simon Spiess,
Alfred Bruno Ganz
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.07.2005
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Eschenbach (SG)
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-170.4.005.717-7
UID/VAT
CHE-112.445.177
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von umfassenden Dienstleistungen für Schweizer Vorsorgeeinrichtungen, institutionelle Anleger und vermögende Privatpersonen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
SWA Swiss Auditors AG | Freienbach | 17.07.2023 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
OBT AG | St. Gallen | 04.11.2013 | 16.07.2023 | |
CONVISA Revisions AG | Freienbach | 27.04.2011 | 03.11.2013 | |
Honegger Treuhand AG | Freienbach | 11.09.2007 | 26.04.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Assurinvest Advisory AG
- AI Pension & Financial Services AG
- AVORA GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Assurinvest AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006073095, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Assurinvest AG, in Eschenbach (SG), CHE-112.445.177, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 57 vom 21.03.2024, Publ. 1005991487).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schmidt, Michael Niklaus, von Zürich, in Hinwil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Werdenberg, Daniel, von Basel und Allschwil, in Gähwil (Kirchberg (SG)), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005991487, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Assurinvest AG, in Eschenbach (SG), CHE-112.445.177, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 176 vom 12.09.2023, Publ. 1005836249).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Thürig Arnold, Martina Erna, von Malters, in Neuheim, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Wiede, Lukas, von Nidau, in Oberembrach, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005836249, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Assurinvest AG, in Eschenbach (SG), CHE-112.445.177, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 17.07.2023, Publ. 1005796982).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rohr, Christian, von Winterthur, in Wil SG, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.