Reports for alcomsys gmbh in Liquidation
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout alcomsys gmbh in Liquidation
- alcomsys gmbh in Liquidation is active in the industry «IT services» and is currently in liquidation. The legal headquarters are in Steffisburg.
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 05.11.2001.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 13.02.2024.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company alcomsys gmbh in Liquidation is the following: CHE-109.376.498.
- Companies with the same address as alcomsys gmbh in Liquidation: ACD Engineering AG, ACD Holding AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.11.2001
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Steffisburg
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.4.015.109-9
UID/VAT
CHE-109.376.498
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringen von Dienstleistungen sowie Verkauf im Bereich EDV-Systeme. Kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben oder veräussern.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- alcomsys gmbh
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: alcomsys gmbh in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: LS02-0000063904, Commercial Registry Office Berne
Rubrik: Liquidationsschuldenrufe Unterrubrik: Liquidationsschuldenruf einer Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Publikationsdatum: SHAB 13.02.2024 Öffentlich einsehbar bis: 13.02.2029 Meldungsnummer: Publizierende Stelle Rudolf C. Graf, Notariat, Langenthalstrasse 33, 4912 Aarwangen Liquidationsschuldenruf alcomsys gmbh in Liquidation Organisation in Auflösung: alcomsys gmbh in Liquidation CHE-109.376.498 Bösbachstrasse 16
Kontaktstelle: Rudolf C. Graf, Notariat, Langenthalstrasse 33, Postfach, 4912 Aarwangen,
Publication number: HR02-1005843390, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
alcomsys gmbh, in Steffisburg, CHE-109.376.498, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 251 vom 29.12.2008, S.4, Publ. 4802630).
Firma neu:
alcomsys gmbh in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 13.09.2023 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lüthi, Andreas, von Linden, in Reichenbach im Kandertal, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wiedmer, Ruth, von Belp und Buchholterberg, in Reichenbach im Kandertal, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, Liquidatorin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00 und mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00].
Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
alcomsys gmbh, in Steffisburg, Bösbachstrasse 16, 3612 Steffisburg, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
2.11.2001.
Zweck:
Erbringen von Dienstleistungen sowie Verkauf im Bereich EDV-Systeme. Kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben oder veräussern.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.--.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB.
Liberierung Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.--.
Mitteilungen an Gesellschafter:
schriftlich.
Eingetragene Personen:
Lüthi, Andreas, von Linden, in Reichenbach im Kandertal, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 19'000.--;
Wiedmer, Ruth, von Belp und Buchholterberg, in Reichenbach im Kandertal, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 1'000.--.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.