Reports for Adrian Michel Group AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Adrian Michel Group AG
- Adrian Michel Group AG has its legal headquarters in Walde AG, is active and operates in the sector «Production of metal goods».
- The company was founded on 20.05.1925 and has 6 persons in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 17.03.2022.
- The reported UID is CHE-102.041.045.
Management (6)
newest board members
Executive board
Sebastian Konkol,
Heinz Zampatti,
Martin Leuzinger,
Hans Rudolf Würgler
newest authorized signatories
Sebastian Konkol,
Francesco Franzé,
Per Holmberg,
Heinz Zampatti,
Martin Leuzinger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.05.1925
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Schmiedrued
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.004.743-1
UID/VAT
CHE-102.041.045
Sector
Production of metal goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Konstruktion von Werkzeugen, Werkzeugbau, Metallumformung und Fabrikation von Stanzartikeln für elektromechanische, medizinal- und prozesstechnische Industrien sowie Herstellung und Handel mit elektrotechnischen Apparaten und Bedarfsartikeln; kann auch Liegenschaften erwerben und veräussern, Filialen und Tochtergesellschaften betreiben sowie sich an Unternehmen beteiligen, solche erwerben oder mit solchen fusionieren, wenn sie mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft in einem Zusammenhang stehen oder demselben dienlich sein können.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Aarau | 25.01.2019 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Wibe - Treuhand AG | Muri (AG) | 12.06.2008 | 24.01.2019 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Adrian Michel AG, Walde
- Michel Adrian AG, Walde
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Adrian Michel Group AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005429474, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Adrian Michel Group AG, in Schmiedrued, CHE-102.041.045, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 241 vom 10.12.2021, Publ. 1005354750).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hunziker, Christian, von Moosleerau, in Moosleerau, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Recher, Nathanaël, von Ziefen, in Rheinfelden, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Uecer, Gonca, von Buchs (AG), in Aarau, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Konkol, Sebastian, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Pratteln, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005354750, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Adrian Michel Group AG, in Schmiedrued, CHE-102.041.045, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 83 vom 30.04.2020, Publ. 1004880508).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Franzé, Francesco, schwedischer Staatsangehöriger, in Bromma (SE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Holmberg, Per, schwedischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zollikon, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1004880508, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Adrian Michel AG, Walde, in Schmiedrued, CHE-102.041.045, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 74 vom 17.04.2020, Publ. 1004872894).
Statutenänderung:
20.04.2020.
Firma neu:
Adrian Michel Group AG.
Zweck neu:
Konstruktion von Werkzeugen, Werkzeugbau, Metallumformung und Fabrikation von Stanzartikeln für elektromechanische, medizinal- und prozesstechnische Industrien sowie Herstellung und Handel mit elektrotechnischen Apparaten und Bedarfsartikeln;
kann auch Liegenschaften erwerben und veräussern, Filialen und Tochtergesellschaften betreiben sowie sich an Unternehmen beteiligen, solche erwerben oder mit solchen fusionieren, wenn sie mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft in einem Zusammenhang stehen oder demselben dienlich sein können.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Holmberg, Per, schwedischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zollikon, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Hunziker, Christian, von Moosleerau, in Moosleerau, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Leuzinger, Martin, von Glarus Nord, in Ostermundigen, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Recher, Nathanaël, von Ziefen, in Rheinfelden, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zampatti, Heinz, von Brusio, in Langnau am Albis, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.